Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (101-35) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {803228/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/13/2023 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Appropriations | ||
House | 11/15/2022 | Pre-filed |