House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {913126/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Appropriations |