House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (133-4) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |