House | 05/28/2023 | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {153128/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Appropriations |