House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 245 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (33-14) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Floor Amendment {833328/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (17-30) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (99-37) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Floor Amendment {913523/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (38-97) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Floor Amendment {373529/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (36-99) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Floor Amendment {283723/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (35-96) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |