Senate | 04/07/2023 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (133-1) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {393124/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Judiciary |