House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {983620/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Appropriations |