House | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Judiciary |