Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Third Reading Passed (96-38) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Floor Amendment {723520/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (37-98) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Floor Amendment {553221/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (37-98) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {453120/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Judiciary |