House | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 770 | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {113728/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {803623/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 09/01/2022 | Pre-filed |