House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {253520/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {373921/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Economic Matters |