Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {263324/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (131-4) | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {333128/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Appropriations |