House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Third Reading Passed (109-29) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (37-8) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {793525/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Third Reading Passed (103-34) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {363126/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |