House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Hearing 4/10 at 4:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (123-16) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {573123/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Appropriations |