House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Third Reading Passed (34-13) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (98-37) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {933624/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |