House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350 | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {533326/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {783128/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |