House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (123-16) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {303626/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (131-4) | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {763821/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |