House | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (102-36) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (39-4) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Floor Amendment {893524/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {653428/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (100-36) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {653028/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |