Maryland 2023 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB831 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/10/2023

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *hb0831*  
  
HOUSE BILL 831 
M3   	3lr1750 
      
By: Delegate Stein 
Introduced and read first time: February 9, 2023 
Assigned to: Environment and Transportation 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Environment – Septic Systems – Online Database 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of the Environment to develop and maintain 3 
a certain online database of all septic systems installed in the State to track certain 4 
information; requiring a local jurisdiction to report certain information to the 5 
Department in a certain manner; requiring the Department to establish a workgroup 6 
to oversee the development and population of the database; and generally relating 7 
to an online database for septic systems.  8 
 
BY adding to 9 
 Article – Environment 10 
Section 9–1114 11 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 12 
 (2014 Replacement Volume and 2022 Supplement) 13 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 14 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 15 
 
Article – Environment 16 
 
9–1114. 17 
 
 (A) SUBJECT TO SUBSECTION (C) OF THIS SECTION , THE DEPARTMENT 18 
SHALL DEVELOP AND MA INTAIN AN ONLINE DATABASE OF ALL SEPT IC SYSTEMS 19 
INSTALLED IN THE STATE FOR THE PURPOSE OF TRACKING THE FOLLOWING 20 
INFORMATION : 21 
 
 (1) LOCATION, INCLUDING PROPERTY A DDRESS AND LOCATION ON 22 
THE PROPERTY; 23 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 831  
 
 
 (2) PERMIT NUMBER ;  1 
 
 (3) DATE OF INSTALLATION ;  2 
 
 (4) SOIL EVALUATION TESTS ;  3 
 
 (5) NAME OF DESIGNER AND I NSTALLERS;  4 
 
 (6) TYPE OF SYSTEM;  5 
 
 (7) WHETHER THE PROPERTY IS RESIDENTIAL , COMMERCIAL , OR 6 
INDUSTRIAL;  7 
 
 (8) LOCATION OF THE BACKUP DRAIN FIELD , IF APPLICABLE; AND 8 
 
 (9) REPAIR HISTORY, IF A PERMIT WAS REQUIRED . 9 
 
 (B) (1) EACH LOCAL JURISDICTI ON SHALL REPORT INFORMATION ON 10 
SEPTIC SYSTEMS TO THE DEPARTMENT IN A MANNE R DETERMINED BY THE 11 
DEPARTMENT . 12 
 
 (2) A LOCAL JURISDICTION T HAT ALREADY MAINTAIN S AN ONLINE 13 
DATABASE FOR SEPTIC SYSTEMS : 14 
 
 (I) MAY PROVIDE THE LINK TO THE DATABASE WEBSITE TO 15 
THE DEPARTMENT TO SATISFY THE REQUIREMENT UNDER PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS 16 
SUBSECTION; AND 17 
 
 (II) SHALL MAINTAIN INFORMATION THAT IS SIMILAR TO THE 18 
INFORMATION REQUIRED UNDER SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION.  19 
 
 (C) IN INITIALLY MAINTAINING THE DATABASE REQUIRE D UNDER 20 
SUBSECTION (A) OF THIS SECTION , THE DEPARTMENT SHALL UPDATE THE 21 
DATABASE: 22 
 
 (1) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2026, WITH INFORMATION FOR ALL 23 
SEPTIC SYSTEMS INSTA LLED IN THE STATE SINCE THE YEAR 2000; AND 24 
 
 (2) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1, 2033, WITH INFORMATION FOR ALL 25 
SEPTIC SYSTEMS INSTA LLED IN THE STATE BEFORE THE YEAR 2000. 26 
 
 (D) (1) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ESTA BLISH A WORKGROUP TO 27 
OVERSEE THE DEVELOPM ENT AND POPULATION O F THE DATABASE . 28   	HOUSE BILL 831 	3 
 
 
 
 (2) THE WORKGROUP SHALL I NCLUDE:  1 
 
 (I) ONE REPRESENTATIVE OF THE DEPARTMENT ;  2 
 
 (II) ONE REPRESENTATIVE OF AN ENVIRONMENTAL ADV OCACY 3 
ORGANIZATION ;  4 
 
 (III) ONE REPRESENTATIVE TH AT IS AN ENVIRONMENT AL 5 
HEALTH SPECIALIST ; 6 
 
 (IV) ONE REPRESENTATIVE OF THE STATE BOARD OF ON–SITE 7 
WASTEWATER PROFESSIONALS ; AND 8 
 
 (V) ONE REPRESENTATIVE OF THE MARYLAND ASSOCIATION 9 
OF REALTORS.  10 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 11 
October 1, 2023. 12