Senate | 04/10/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Third Reading Passed (121-18) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {293920/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 11/01/2022 | Pre-filed |