House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Third Reading Passed (108-30) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Floor Amendment {893021/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (37-99) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {563627/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 11/16/2022 | Pre-filed |