Senate | 04/10/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Hearing 4/10 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {513426/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |