House
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (120-19)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {743227/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (110-24)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2023
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2023
|
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
|
|
|