House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (129-10) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-4) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {973025/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (103-31) | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {143528/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |