House | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {433127/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |