House | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (104-36) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (35-12) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {633127/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reassigned to Finance Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Third Reading Passed (100-34) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {343329/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | First Reading Appropriations |