Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Third Reading Passed (114-22) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 11/18/2022 | Pre-filed |