Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (102-29) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {393720/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 10/19/2022 | Pre-filed |