House | 03/15/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {143229/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 09/01/2022 | Pre-filed |