House | 03/07/2023 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Referred Ways and Means Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 11/16/2022 | Pre-filed |