Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Floor Amendment {133523/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (37-95)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Floor Amendment {993028/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (39-93)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {903826/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {193321/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2023
|
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|