Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 688 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (116-19) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {803121/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 11/18/2022 | Pre-filed |