House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {253121/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/16/2023 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 11/20/2022 | Pre-filed |