Senate | 05/08/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (132-4) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {273529/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/26/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {453420/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Lam) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {613529/1 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2023 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | First Reading Finance |