House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (110-27) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {893922/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {893922/1 | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {903722/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |