Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (129-1) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {583223/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |