Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (128-6)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Favorable Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2023
|
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2023
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Floor Amendment {513721/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {983720/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {983720/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {983720/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First Reading Budget and Taxation
|
|
|