House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Third Reading Passed (33-13) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Favorable as Amended Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Committee Amendment Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {153922/1 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | First Reading Finance |