House | 04/05/2023 | Rereferred to Economic Matters and Appropriations | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {103021/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |