Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (118-18) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {903827/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |