Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |