Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {103624/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |