House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {623625/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |