Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (102-36)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Conference Committee Report {643522/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Barve and Crosby)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
House Refuses Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Augustine, Hester and Simonaire)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Senate Requests House Recede
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2023
|
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (102-33)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {533925/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Floor Amendment {243329/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Floor Amendment {423621/1 (Senator James) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Floor Amendment {743628/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {933629/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments {933629/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|