House | 04/10/2023 | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Qi, Adams and Crosby) | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | House Refuses Recede | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Senate Requests House Recede | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Third Reading Passed (102-34) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Floor Amendment {343620/1 (Delegate Hartman) Adopted | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Delegate Hartman) Adopted | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/15/2023 | Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 11/18/2022 | Pre-filed |