Senate | 04/24/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Floor Amendment {383029/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (36-100) | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {723528/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Hearing 3/02 at 4:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |