House | 03/29/2023 | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Rereferred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |