Senate | 05/03/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Third Reading Passed (112-23) | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {113027/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Health and Government Operations Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading Passed (38-5) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {243528/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/28/2023 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | First Reading Finance |