Senate | 05/16/2023 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {763926/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |