House | 04/10/2023 | Rereferred to Economic Matters | ||
House | 04/08/2023 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/07/2023 | Third Reading Passed (41-4) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments {333723/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | First Reading Finance |